Accounts and annual returns WESTERTON PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1101613
Charity reporting is overdue by 723 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 358 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 723 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 February 2021 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 17 February 2020 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required