THE NEWLAND CHRISTIAN TRUST

Charity number: 1101648
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 December 2019 41 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time Download