Financial history WATFORD FC'S COMMUNITY SPORTS & EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1102239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £2.69m £3.53m £2.68m £2.43m £4.17m
Total expenditure £2.69m £3.01m £2.65m £2.47m £3.47m
Income from government contracts £140.00k £80.00k £129.50k £154.54k £496.36k
Income from government grants £184.15k £113.00k £137.00k £184.70k £121.16k
Income - Donations and legacies £280.77k £239.24k £162.85k £310.95k £363.80k
Income - Other trading activities £79.11k £76.63k £40.85k £0 £41.92k
Income - Charitable activities £2.32m £3.20m £2.46m £2.11m £3.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.27k £11.34k £12.26k £6.50k £11.78k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £238.19k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.59m £2.96m £2.61m £2.44m £3.44m
Expenditure - Raising funds £44.45k £49.85k £42.95k £25.39k £38.68k
Expenditure - Governance £13.13k £11.70k £13.97k £13.87k £14.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £52.00k £0 £0 £0 £0