ADAM KHAN MUSLIM TRUST

Charity number: 1101930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 January 2021 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 02 April 2020 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 26 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 25 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 27 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required