Accounts and annual returns ST JOHNS AND ST CLEMENTS PTFA

Charity number: 1102196
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 October 2021 01 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2020 27 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2019 23 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2018 02 January 2020 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 October 2017 08 October 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 October 2017 Not Required