ST JAMES CE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1101797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £12.02k £8.86k £16.94k £13.14k £4.93k
Total expenditure £7.30k £1.30k £18.68k £15.80k £4.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A