Equality and Employment Law Centre

Charity number: 1101876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 29 March 2018 30 January 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2018 30 January 2019 1 days late Download
Annual return 29 March 2017 04 April 2018 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 March 2017 04 April 2018 65 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 27 February 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 February 2017 17 days late