ST JOSEPH'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL STOURBRIDGE PTA

Charity number: 1102175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 18 July 2021 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 15 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 December 2019 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 09 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required