ST JOSEPH'S CATHOLIC SCHOOL STOURBRIDGE PTA

Charity number: 1102175
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.59k £8.32k £6.06k £5.81k £3.42k
Total expenditure £6.59k £8.06k £7.18k £3.45k £4.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A