Crofton Partnership

Charity number: 1101987
Charity reporting is overdue by 157 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £566 £484 £228 £136 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £3.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A