Financial history SOUTHERN AFRICAN CHILDREN AND FAMILY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £100 £100 £100 £0 £0
Total expenditure £100 £100 £100 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A