Accounts and annual returns THE ESFANDI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1103095
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window