Accounts and annual returns UGANDA CHILDREN IN NEED

Charity number: 1103311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 April 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2020 10 June 2021 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2019 10 June 2021 494 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2018 10 June 2021 859 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 April 2017 09 June 2021 1223 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 April 2017 Not Required