Financial history UGANDA CHILDREN IN NEED

Charity number: 1103311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/04/2017 02/04/2018 02/04/2019 02/04/2020 02/04/2021
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A