Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DEDHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1103634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window