Trustees FRIENDS OF DEDHAM PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1103634
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maralyn Jane Jewell Chair
None on record
Linda Denise Redlich Trustee 17 November 2021
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEDHAM
Received: On time
KEVIN JOHN TAYLOR Trustee 07 September 2017
None on record
JAYNE DEBRA ANDERSON Trustee 07 September 2017
None on record
Suzanne Margaret Woods Trustee 26 April 2017
None on record
David Harvey Druitt Trustee 20 April 2015
None on record
JILL STRANGWARD Trustee 07 April 2015
THE ASSEMBLY ROOMS TRUST, DEDHAM
Received: On time
DAVID RAYMOND JEWELL Trustee 07 April 2015
None on record
MARIA TERESA JOHNSTON Trustee
None on record