Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF ST MARTINS SCHOOL, DORKING

Charity number: 1102204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 04 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required