Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ST MARTINS SCHOOL, DORKING

Charity number: 1102204
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £16.78k £17.54k £8.39k £18.22k £22.62k
Total expenditure £18.55k £23.73k £7.03k £11.18k £28.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A