Financial history ST KEW PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity number: 1103642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.71k £3.46k £1.53k £814 £610
Total expenditure £6.81k £2.14k £1.39k £1.87k £758
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A