Trustees SANDWELL LEISURE TRUST

Charity number: 1102431
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LYNDA BATEMAN Chair
None on record
THOMAS ANTONY LESLIE BARTER Trustee 19 November 2021
None on record
SARAH ROSE FLEMING Trustee 03 November 2021
None on record
RICHARD WILLIAM McVITTIE Trustee 26 January 2021
None on record
Pamela Harpreet Kaur Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Paul Francis Martin Piddock Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Penelope Jane Venables Trustee 06 February 2014
BIRMINGHAM ETHNIC EDUCATION AND ADVISORY SERVICE TRUST
Received: On time
MIRIAM SHARMA Trustee 18 September 2013
None on record
VALERIE MCFARLAND Trustee
None on record