Accounts and annual returns ST PIRAN TRUST

Charity number: 1103471
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 01 February 2022 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 29 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 14 February 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 14 February 2020 48 days late
Annual return 28 February 2018 31 December 2018 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 31 December 2018 3 days late
Annual return 28 February 2017 22 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 22 December 2017 On time