Financial history ST PIRAN TRUST

Charity number: 1103471
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £8.03k £5.74k £11.80k £9.28k £5.23k
Total expenditure £13.59k £706 £708 £24.89k £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k £4.50k