ST MARY'S PTA

Charity number: 1102556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.92k £4.17k £3.28k £1.80k £3.89k
Total expenditure £8.26k £106 £1.41k £7.45k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A