Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HRMH ELTHAM

Charity number: 1102624
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £129.14k £126.79k £131.40k £68.99k £110.03k
Total expenditure £129.20k £112.25k £112.09k £80.12k £99.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A