Financial history FRIENDS OF ST PAUL'S SCHOOL, ALWOODLEY

Charity number: 1102434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £15.38k £15.86k £7.90k £6.39k £3.87k
Total expenditure £12.85k £22.85k £7.33k £4.78k £3.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A