Financial history BRITISH YOUTH MUSIC THEATRE

Charity number: 1103076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.10m £1.29m £1.24m £499.87k £1.55m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.35m £1.27m £477.45k £1.49m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £112.50k £150.00k £154.25k £335.64k £324.67k
Income - Donations and legacies £266.19k £314.12k £388.31k N/A £406.22k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £837.71k £975.05k £852.54k N/A £933.73k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £208.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.33m £1.24m N/A £1.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.76k £26.33k £36.20k N/A £57.50k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A £8.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0