GLOBAL CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1104311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £5.00k £3.00k £4.00k £5.00k £5.50k
Total expenditure £4.95k £2.90k £3.90k £4.90k £5.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A