Accounts and annual returns CHRIST CHURCH CENTRAL

Charity number: 1102856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 05 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 10 December 2017 On time Download Open in new window