Financial history HELP COUNSELLING FOR 9 TO 25 YEAR OLDS (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity number: 1103888
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £14.80k £24.33k £10.64k £11.26k £17.56k
Total expenditure £14.02k £14.69k £13.19k £16.19k £16.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A