ST JOSEPHS IN THE PARK PARENTS FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1102971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £63.02k £65.68k £24.86k £22.88k £19.44k
Total expenditure £62.17k £68.74k £19.02k £11.36k £7.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A