ST KITTS-NEVIS ASSOCIATION (SLOUGH)

Charity number: 1104873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 November 2019 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 16 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 24 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 10 July 2016 On time Download