TRINITY CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1103028
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £151.13k £157.54k £186.83k £176.38k £181.62k
Total expenditure £151.13k £140.28k £199.62k £95.63k £167.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A