ST ANNE'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION SADDLEWORTH

Charity number: 1102800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 13 September 2019 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required