ST ANNE'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION SADDLEWORTH

Charity number: 1102800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £13.15k £12.64k £11.72k £12.44k £6.76k
Total expenditure £6.40k £4.29k £15.49k £10.23k £11.44k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A