Financial history OLD PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1103059
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.30k £7.99k £8.48k £2.26k £5.03k
Total expenditure £7.78k £3.81k £8.38k £3.01k £3.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A