Accounts and annual returns SOUNDABOUT

Charity number: 1103002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 22 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window