Financial history JUNIOR LEAGUE OF LONDON

Charity number: 1103298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £167.66k £172.56k £160.42k £133.84k £116.11k
Total expenditure £178.65k £163.98k £150.49k £137.36k £133.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.00k N/A N/A N/A