Trustees JUNIOR LEAGUE OF LONDON
Charity number: 1103298

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanna Claire Pitts Teixidor | Trustee | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Phelps Allen | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emily Brandmeyer Healy | Trustee | 28 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Rachel Skibo | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francine Rosalie Bosco | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Victoria Young | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Johnson Niedringhaus | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tamsin Angharad Davies | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Garcia | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.