Accounts and annual returns MAKE IT HAPPEN APPEAL

Charity number: 1103170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 05 July 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 08 January 2020 192 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 09 July 2018 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required