Accounts and annual returns AVERY HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 12 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 31 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 31 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2019 13 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 13 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 10 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window