Financial history TRINITY COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1103453
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £471.84k £609.62k £629.65k £484.71k £603.08k
Total expenditure £545.38k £542.32k £603.61k £481.54k £509.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £69.41k
Income from government grants £2.25k £3.74k £1.00k £5.00k £69.41k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £4.99k £3.61k N/A £14.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £575.62k £606.33k N/A £350.49k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £28.88k £19.37k N/A £31.18k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A £124 £346 N/A £23
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £206.91k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £30.47k £13.73k N/A £0
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £511.85k £589.89k N/A £509.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A £0