Financial history WOMEN'S INTERFAITH NETWORK

Charity number: 1103676
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £434.79k £434.79k £149.82k £497.60k £245.91k
Total expenditure £174.22k £174.22k £77.84k £341.78k £188.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A