BASINGSTOKE HINDU SOCIETY

Charity number: 1107780
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 26 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 July 2019 10 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 16 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 07 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 07 May 2017 On time Download