PORTHALLOW VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1118168
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.38k £11.69k £11.26k £10.83k £14.74k
Total expenditure £11.46k £9.08k £9.45k £10.32k £9.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A