BARKSTON ASH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1103706
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 March 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required