TWIN VISION

Charity number: 1106163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £104.58k £83.42k £60.35k £89.25k £50.22k
Total expenditure £111.65k £92.57k £59.96k £90.86k £53.88k
Income from government contracts £47.71k £0 £7.82k £13.02k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A