Accounts and annual returns ST. JAMES THE LESS RC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT, PRIEST & TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1103421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 April 2021 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2019 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required