Trustees THE HEARTH CENTRE (HORSLEY) LTD
Charity number: 1106143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Edward Stoker | Trustee | 05 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Peter Duckworth | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Dale Robertson | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Ann Robertson | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Straw | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Avril Robinson | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Siddle | Trustee | 09 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lucy Millard | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.