KIND AID INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1105781
Charity reporting is up to date (31 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 December 2020 31 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 December 2019 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 December 2019 60 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 December 2018 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 December 2018 61 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 November 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 November 2017 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 15 December 2016 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 15 December 2016 45 days late Download