FRIENDS OF BALDERSBY ST. JAMES SCHOOL

Charity number: 1103971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £1.52k £3.91k £2.11k £3.04k £1.69k
Total expenditure £2.82k £2.65k £1.52k £3.18k £1.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A